Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/21/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/10/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/19/2000