Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/03/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/08/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/10/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/10/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/16/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/16/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/16/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/18/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/12/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/15/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/20/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/28/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/28/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/28/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/19/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/19/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/24/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/24/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/18/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/18/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/26/2000