Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/09/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/09/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/10/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/10/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/11/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/11/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/11/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/11/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/11/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/11/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/11/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/16/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/18/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/18/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/18/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/18/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/18/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/18/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/18/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/18/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/18/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/18/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/18/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/22/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/22/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/23/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/23/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/23/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/08/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/18/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/26/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/02/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/04/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/04/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/04/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/04/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/11/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/24/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/24/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/24/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/24/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/24/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/24/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/24/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/02/2000