There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area and Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness Act of 2000

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area and Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area and Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area and the Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/24/2000Became Public Law No: 106-353. (TXT | PDF)
10/24/2000Signed by President.
10/12/2000Presented to President.
10/05/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9975-9976, S9990)
10/02/2000Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-460.
07/25/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6870-6872)
04/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
10/24/2000Became Public Law No: 106-353. (TXT | PDF)
10/24/2000Signed by President.
10/12/2000HousePresented to President.
10/06/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/05/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9975-9976, S9990)
10/02/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 907.
10/02/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-460.
09/20/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/13/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management
07/25/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/25/2000-4:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2000-4:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6870-6872)
07/25/2000-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate H.R. 4275.
07/25/2000-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6870-6875)
07/25/2000-4:07pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/19/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/19/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/22/2000HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
06/22/2000HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
05/18/2000HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
05/09/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/09/2000HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
04/13/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
04/13/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources04/13/2000 Referred to
07/19/2000 Markup by
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/09/2000 Referred to
05/18/2000 Hearings by
06/22/2000 Markup by
06/22/2000 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/25/2000 Referred to
09/20/2000 Markup by
10/02/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-460
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management09/13/2000 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/25/2000)

Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area and Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness Act of 2000 - Establishes the Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area, consisting of specified public land in Colorado and Utah.

Designates certain lands in Mesa County, Colorado, and Grand County, Utah, as wilderness and designates such area as the Black Ridge Canyons Wilderness.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to manage both the Conservation Area and the Wilderness. Withdraws all lands within the Conservation Area and Wilderness from all forms of entry under the public land laws, including mining laws and mineral and geothermal leasing laws.

Directs the Secretary to develop a comprehensive plan for the long-range protection and management of the Conservation Area and the Wilderness. States that Congress does not intend for the establishment of buffer zones around such lands.

Authorizes the Secretary to establish minimal interpretive sites in cooperation with other public or private entities.

States that neither the Conservation Area nor the Wilderness shall include any part of the Colorado River to the 100-year high water mark. Withdraws all Federal lands between such marks on each shore from all forms of entry under the public land laws, including mining laws and mineral and geothermal leasing laws.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish the Colorado Canyons National Conservation Area Advisory Council; and (2) continue to allow certain public and private access to the Conservation Area and Wilderness.