Committees: H.R.4275 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources04/13/2000 Referred to
07/19/2000 Markup by
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/09/2000 Referred to
05/18/2000 Hearings by
06/22/2000 Markup by
06/22/2000 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/25/2000 Referred to
09/20/2000 Markup by
10/02/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-460
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management09/13/2000 Hearings by