Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/22/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/13/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/29/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/17/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/25/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/25/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/14/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/26/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/26/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/27/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/04/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/04/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/10/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/18/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/18/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/27/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/31/2000