There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

ICCVAM Authorization Act of 2000

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

ICCVAM Authorization Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

ICCVAM Authorization Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish, wherever feasible, guidelines, recommendations, and regulations that promote the regulatory acceptance of new and revised toxicological tests that protect human and animal health and the environment while reducing, refining, or replacing animal tests and ensuring human safety and product effectiveness.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/19/2000Became Public Law No: 106-545. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2000Signed by President.
12/08/2000Presented to President.
12/06/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11648-11649)
10/17/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10007-10008)
10/16/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-980.
04/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/19/2000Became Public Law No: 106-545. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2000Signed by President.
12/08/2000HousePresented to President.
12/07/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11648-11649)
10/18/2000SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/17/2000-5:22pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-5:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10007-10008)
10/17/2000-5:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4281.
10/17/2000-5:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10007-10011)
10/17/2000-5:14pmHouseMr. Bliley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/16/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 578.
10/16/2000HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-980.
10/05/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/05/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/26/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
04/13/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Commerce.
04/13/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/02/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/09/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/09/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/18/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/27/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/27/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/05/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce04/13/2000 Referred to
10/05/2000 Markup by
10/16/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-980
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/26/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4281. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/17/2000)

ICCVAM Authorization Act of 2000 - Defines "alternative test method" as a test method that reduces the number of animals required, refines procedures to lessen or eliminate pain or distress to animals, enhances animal well-being, or replaces animals with non-animal systems or one animal species with a lower animal species, such as replacing a mammal with an invertebrate.

(Sec. 3) Makes the Interagency Coordinating Committee on the Validation of Alternative Methods (ICCVAM) a permanent interagency coordinating committee of the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences.

Sets forth ICCVAM objectives, including: (1) increasing the efficiency of Federal test method review; and (2) reducing animal testing where feasible.

Directs the Institute to establish a Scientific Advisory Committee.

Sets forth ICCVAM duties.

(Sec. 4) Requires each Federal agency to: (1) identify and forward to ICCVAM any test method specified in a regulation or guideline that requires or recommends animal testing; (2) promote valid alternative test methods if the alternatives are effective for generating data (in an amount and of a scientific value that is at least equivalent to the data generated from existing tests) for hazard identification, dose-response assessment, or risk assessment; and (3) adopt ICCVAM recommendations unless the agency finds that the recommendations are inadequate or unsatisfactory.

(Sec. 5) Makes this Act inapplicable to research related to the causes, diagnosis, treatment, control, or prevention of physical or mental diseases or impairments of humans or animals.