Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/02/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/09/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/09/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/18/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/27/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/27/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/05/2000