Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/13/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/04/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/04/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/18/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/18/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/18/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/18/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 06/07/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/07/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/23/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/23/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/23/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/19/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/19/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/25/2000