There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Born-Alive Infants Protection Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Born-Alive Infants Protection Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect infants who are born alive.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 15, 3 Present (Roll no. 495).(text: CR H8154-8155)
09/11/2000Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-835.
04/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/05/2000SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/27/2000SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/26/2000-8:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2000-8:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 15, 3 Present (Roll no. 495). (text: CR H8154-8155)
09/26/2000-7:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4292.
09/26/2000-7:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8154-8162)
09/26/2000-7:14pmHouseMr. Canady moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/21/2000HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7967-7968)
09/21/2000HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7967-7968)
09/11/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
09/11/2000HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-835.
07/26/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 1.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/26/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/21/2000HouseSubcommittee on the Constitution Discharged.
07/20/2000HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
07/14/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/13/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/13/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/08/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/11/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/27/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/07/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/13/2000 Referred to
07/26/2000 Markup by
09/11/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-835
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution07/14/2000 Referred to
07/20/2000 Hearings by
07/21/2000 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2000)

Born-Alive Infants Protection Act of 2000 - Directs that in determining the meaning of any Act of Congress or of any ruling, regulation, or interpretation of the various U.S. administrative bureaus and agencies, the words "person," "human being," "child," and "individual" shall include every infant member of the species homo sapiens who is born alive (as defined in this Act) at any stage of development.