Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/02/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/02/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/02/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/02/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/03/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/09/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/09/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/09/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/09/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/11/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/11/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/24/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/03/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/03/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/03/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/09/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/09/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/09/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/09/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/09/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/11/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/16/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/18/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/18/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/20/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/20/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/20/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/04/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/12/1999