Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2000