There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Red River National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Red River National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Red River National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Red River National Wildlife Refuge Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Red River National Wildlife Refuge.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/13/2000Became Public Law No: 106-300. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2000Signed by President.
10/06/2000Presented to President.
10/04/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9867)
10/02/2000Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH without amendment. With written report No. 106-462.
09/12/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7388-7389)
09/06/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-809.
04/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/13/2000Became Public Law No: 106-300. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2000Signed by President.
10/06/2000HousePresented to President.
10/05/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/04/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9867)
10/02/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 909.
10/02/2000SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH without amendment. With written report No. 106-462.
09/28/2000SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/21/2000SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
09/13/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/12/2000-3:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2000-3:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7388-7389)
09/12/2000-3:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4318.
09/12/2000-3:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7388-7389)
09/12/2000-3:15pmHouseMr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/06/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 470.
09/06/2000HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-809.
07/26/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/26/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/20/2000HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
07/20/2000HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
05/11/2000HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
04/26/2000HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
04/26/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/13/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
04/13/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources04/13/2000 Referred to
07/26/2000 Markup by
09/06/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-809
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans04/26/2000 Referred to
05/11/2000 Hearings by
07/20/2000 Markup by
07/20/2000 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works09/13/2000 Referred to
09/28/2000 Markup by
10/02/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-462

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2000)

Red River National Wildlife Refuge Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to establish the Red River National Wildlife Refuge in Louisiana.

Requires the Secretary to issue a management plan for the Refuge which includes provisions for: (1) the planning and design of trails and access points; (2) the planning of wildlife and habitat restoration, including reforestation; (3) permanent exhibits and facilities and regular educational programs throughout the Refuge; and (4) ensuring that hunting, fishing, wildlife observation and photography and environmental education and interpretation are priority general public uses. Requires that the Secretary: (1) provide an opportunity for public participation in developing such plan; and (2) give special consideration to views by local public and private entities and individuals.

Directs the Secretary to construct, administer, and maintain within the Refuge, a wildlife interpretation and education center to promote environmental education and to provide an opportunity for the study and enjoyment of wildlife in its natural habitat.

Requires the Secretary to provide to the Red River Waterway Commission: (1) technical assistance in monitoring water quality, noxious plants, and exotic organisms and in preventing siltation of prime fisheries habitat; and (2) fish for stocking.

Authorizes appropriations.