Committees: H.R.4318 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources04/13/2000 Referred to
07/26/2000 Markup by
09/06/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-809
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans04/26/2000 Referred to
05/11/2000 Hearings by
07/20/2000 Markup by
07/20/2000 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works09/13/2000 Referred to
09/28/2000 Markup by
10/02/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-462