Committees: H.R.434 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/02/1999 Referred to
02/11/1999 Markup by
02/16/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-19,Part 1
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa02/03/1999 Referred to
02/11/1999 Hearings by
House Ways and Means02/02/1999 Referred to
06/10/1999 Markup by
06/17/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-19,Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/03/1999 Referred to
02/03/1999 Markup by
02/03/1999 Reported by
House Banking and Financial Services02/02/1999 Referred to
06/17/1999 Discharged from
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy02/12/1999 Referred to