Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/03/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/03/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/25/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/25/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/09/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/09/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/09/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/23/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/29/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/13/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2000