Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/04/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/06/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/06/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/06/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/06/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/06/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/06/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/07/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/07/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/08/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/08/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/08/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/08/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/08/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/09/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/09/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/09/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/13/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/13/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/14/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/14/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/14/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/14/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/14/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/14/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/14/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/14/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/14/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/14/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/14/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/14/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/14/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/29/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/29/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/18/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/27/2000