There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State Children's Health Insurance Program (SCHIP) Preservation Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that amounts allotted to a State under section 2104 of the Social Security Act for each of fiscal years 1998 and 1999 shall remain available through fiscal year 2002.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/15/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
05/08/2000Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/11/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/11/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/17/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/20/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/27/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/04/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/12/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/25/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce05/08/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/15/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4393. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2000)

State Children's Health Insurance Program (SCHIP) Preservation Act of 2000 - Requires amounts allotted to a State under title XXI (Children's Health Insurance) of the Social Security Act for FY 1998 and 1999 to remain available through FY 2002, notwithstanding a specified time limitation on the availability of such amounts.