Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/11/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/11/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/17/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/20/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/27/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/04/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/12/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/25/2000