Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/08/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/11/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/16/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/08/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/08/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/12/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/12/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/14/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/26/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/24/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/07/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/07/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/04/2000