There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 440 South Orange Blossom Trail in Orlando, Florida, as the "Arthur 'Pappy' Kennedy Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/27/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 10/26/2000 H11354)
05/09/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/27/2000SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/27/2000-1:36pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/27/2000-1:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/27/2000-1:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 10/26/2000 H11354)
10/27/2000-1:36pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H11405)
10/26/2000-10:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McHugh objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until Oct. 27. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
10/26/2000-10:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4399.
10/26/2000-10:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11354)
10/26/2000-10:00pmHouseMr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/12/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/11/2000HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2957)
05/09/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
05/09/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform05/09/2000 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Postal Service05/12/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4399.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4399. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/27/2000)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 440 South Orange Blossom Trail in Orlando, Florida, as the Arthur "Pappy" Kennedy Post Office.