Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/11/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/11/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/11/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/11/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/11/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/11/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/11/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/24/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/10/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/23/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/20/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/20/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/04/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/06/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/27/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/21/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/27/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/03/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/03/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/03/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/04/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/15/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/27/2000