There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Unlawful Internet Gambling Funding Prohibition Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet Gambling Funding Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent the use of certain bank instruments for Internet gambling, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2000Committee on Judiciary discharged.
07/20/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Banking and Financial Services. H. Rept. 106-771, Part I.
05/10/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
09/29/2000Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 553.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2000Committee on Judiciary discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2000House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 29, 2000.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2000House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 22, 2000.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Banking and Financial Services. H. Rept. 106-771, Part I.
06/28/2000Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/28/2000Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/20/2000Committee Hearings Held.
05/30/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/10/2000Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2000Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2000Referred to the Committee on Banking and Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/22/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services05/10/2000 Referred to
06/20/2000 Hearings by
06/28/2000 Markup by
07/20/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-771
House Judiciary05/10/2000 Referred to
09/29/2000 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime05/30/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4419.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4419. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (07/20/2000)

Unlawful Internet Gambling Funding Prohibition Act - Prohibits any person engaged in a gambling business from knowingly accepting in connection with the participation of another person in Internet gambling: (1) credit, or the proceeds of credit, extended to another (including credit card extension of credit); (2) an electronic fund transfer or funds transmitted by or through a money transmitting business, or the proceeds of an electronic fund transfer or money transmitting service, from or on behalf of another; (3) any instrument drawn by or on behalf of another and payable through any financial institution; or (4) the proceeds of any other form of financial transaction involving a financial institution as payor or financial intermediary for another.

(Sec. 3) Prescribes judicial guidelines under which the Federal district courts exercise exclusive jurisdiction to prevent or restrain violations of this Act. Provides for civil and criminal penalties, including a permanent injunction against wagering.

Shields certain financial intermediaries from liability for either unknowing involvement or unknowing use of their facilities in: (1) any credit transaction, electronic fund transfer, or money transmitting service; or (2) drawing, paying, transferring, or collecting a check or draft instrument. Cites exceptions for knowing participation in a gambling business.

(Sec. 4) Declares that the Federal Government, in deliberations with a foreign government on money laundering, corruption, and crime issues, should: (1) encourage cooperation by foreign governments and relevant international fora in identifying whether Internet gambling operations are being used for money laundering, corruption, or other crimes; (2) advance policies that promote international cooperation in the enforcement of this Act; and (3) encourage the Financial Action Task Force on Money Laundering to study, in its annual report, the extent to which Internet gambling operations are being used for money laundering.

(Sec. 5) Amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to provide that if an appropriate Federal banking agency determines that an insured depository institution is engaged in activities proscribed under this Act, such agency may issue an injunction against the person in violation of this Act.