Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/11/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/11/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/16/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/13/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2000