Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/04/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 02/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/09/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/11/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/23/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/02/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/02/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/09/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/09/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/09/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/09/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/09/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/24/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/12/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/27/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/13/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/13/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/30/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/30/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/02/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/02/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/02/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/09/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/09/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/09/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/16/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 01/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/30/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/19/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/19/2000