Text: H.R.4435 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-332 (10/19/2000)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 332]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ332.106]


[[Page 114 STAT. 1306]]

Public Law 106-332
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To clarify certain boundaries on the map relating to Unit NC-01 of the 
    Coastal Barrier Resources System. <<NOTE: Oct. 19, 2000 -  [H.R. 
                                4435]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: 16 USC 3503 
note.>> 

SECTION 1. REPLACEMENT OF COASTAL BARRIER RESOURCES SYSTEM MAP.

    (a) In General.--The map described in subsection (b) is replaced, in 
the maps depicting the Coastal Barrier Resources System that are 
referred to in section 4(a) of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 
U.S.C. 3503(a)), by the map entitled ``Pine Island Unit NC-01'' and 
dated May 1, 2000.
    (b) Description of Replaced Map.--The map described in this 
subsection is the map that--
            (1) relates to Pine Island Unit NC-01 located in Currituck 
        and Dare Counties, North Carolina; and
            (2) is included in a set of maps entitled ``Coastal Barrier 
        Resources System'', dated October 24, 1990, revised on October 
        23, 1992, and referred to in section 4(a) of the Coastal Barrier 
        Resources Act (16 U.S.C. 3503(a)).

SEC. 2. AVAILABILITY.

    The Secretary of the Interior shall keep the replacement map 
referred to in section 1 on file and available for inspection in 
accordance with section 4(b) of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 
U.S.C. 3503(b)).

    Approved October 19, 2000.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 4435:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 106-648 (Comm. on Resources).
SENATE REPORTS: No. 106-473 (Comm. on Environment and Public Works).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 146 (2000):
            June 6, 7, considered and passed House.
            Oct. 5, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>

Share This Section