Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/25/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/13/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/14/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/26/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/11/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/19/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/06/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/23/2000