Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/17/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/17/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/09/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/20/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/20/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/28/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/28/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/28/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/28/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/28/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/13/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/13/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/13/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/18/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/07/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/07/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/17/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/30/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2000