Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/18/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/24/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/24/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/24/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/24/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/24/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/24/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/24/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/24/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/24/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/24/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/24/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/24/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/06/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/06/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/06/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/08/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/08/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/14/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/22/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/22/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/22/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/22/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/22/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/26/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/26/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/27/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/27/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/28/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/10/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/18/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/26/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/06/2000