Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/25/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/25/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/25/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/25/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/08/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/15/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/15/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/27/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/20/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/12/2000