Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 05/19/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/13/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/13/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/13/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/13/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/13/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/13/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/13/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/19/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/21/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/26/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/29/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/17/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/17/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/17/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/25/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 09/06/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/05/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/19/2000