Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/23/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/26/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/26/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/26/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/26/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 09/26/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/26/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/03/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/03/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/03/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/03/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/03/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/03/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/03/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/03/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/03/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/03/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/03/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/03/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/03/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/03/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/03/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/03/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/03/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/25/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/25/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/25/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/25/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/26/2000