Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/11/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/11/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/11/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/11/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/15/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/15/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/15/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/01/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/04/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/04/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/08/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/14/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/06/2000