Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/24/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/13/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/13/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/13/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/19/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/26/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/26/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/26/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/29/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/29/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/07/2000