Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/25/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/14/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/14/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/14/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/20/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/11/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/11/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/11/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/13/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/13/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/17/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/20/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/07/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/20/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/20/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/21/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/21/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/27/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/12/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/12/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/18/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/19/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/19/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/14/2000