Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/09/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/23/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/27/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/24/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/26/2000