Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/25/2000