Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/08/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/21/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/22/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/2000