Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/19/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/13/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/25/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/18/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/18/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/24/2000