Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/29/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/29/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/07/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/20/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/20/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/26/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/06/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/11/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/11/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/11/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/27/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/27/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/27/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/15/2000