There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide further protections for the watershed of the Little Sandy River as part of the Bull Run Watershed Management Unit, Oregon, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/28/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/26/2000Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/26/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/26/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/06/2000Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2000Referred to House Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2000Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/06/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/05/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources06/06/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health06/26/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands06/26/2000 Referred to
House Agriculture06/06/2000 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry06/28/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4580.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4580. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2000)

Amends Federal law to reestablish and add acreage to the Bull Run Watershed Management Unit in Oregon.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture or the Interior, as applicable, to prohibit the cutting of trees on Federal land in the entire unit.