Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/09/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/09/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/18/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/19/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/27/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/27/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/05/2000