Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/26/2000