Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/25/2000