Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/13/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/13/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/19/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/19/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/19/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/19/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/07/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/07/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/19/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/19/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/27/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/27/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/02/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/10/2000