Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/23/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/23/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/19/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/02/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew