Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/19/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/19/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/21/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/21/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/21/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/21/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/26/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/27/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/18/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/20/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/12/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/18/2000