Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/15/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/15/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/21/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/22/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/22/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/22/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/18/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/02/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/24/2000