Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/21/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/07/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/07/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/07/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/20/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/20/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/20/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/28/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/28/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/28/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/28/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/17/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/17/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/17/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/17/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/19/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/19/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/19/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/19/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/19/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/26/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/31/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/31/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/15/2000