Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/25/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/16/2000